EP1775352 - Arc ion plating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamagaki, Hiroshi Takasago Works in Kobe Steel Ltd / 3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Hirofumi Takasago Works in Kobe Steel Ltd / 3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | 03 /
Okimoto, TadaoTakasago Works in Kobe Steel Ltd / 3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | 04 /
Miyamoto, Ryoji Takasago Works in Kobe Steel Ltd / 3-1, Shinhama 2 chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | [2013/08] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
Tamagaki, Hiroshi Takasago Works in Kobe Steel Ltd 3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | ||
02 /
Fujii, Hirofumi Takasago Works in Kobe Steel Ltd 3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | |||
03 /
Okimoto, TadaoTakasago Works in Kobe Steel Ltd 3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | |||
04 /
Miyamoto, Ryoji Takasago Works in Kobe Steel Ltd 3-1, Shinhama 2 chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/08] |
Former [2008/27] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06120947.4 | 20.09.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | JP20050301433 | 17.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005301433 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1775352 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1775352 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1775352 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/32, H01J37/32 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
C23C14/325 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/50 (KR);
C23C14/54 (KR);
H01J37/32055 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/3266 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32761 (EP,KR,US);
H01J2237/0206 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/16] | C23C14/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Lichtbogenionenplattieren | [2007/16] | English: | Arc ion plating apparatus | [2007/16] | French: | Appareil de placage ionique à l'arc | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 23.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2006 | AT | 20.02.2013 | BE | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | GB | 20.09.2013 | IE | 20.09.2013 | LU | 20.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
GB | 20.09.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
GB | 20.09.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
IE | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5618590 (NARUSE YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 27; figure 1 *; | [DA]JPH04276062 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [DA] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]JPH1046324 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]JP2004225065 (MITSUBISHI MAT KOBE TOOLS CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001152320 (EBARA CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - HUANG R F ET AL, "Wear-resistant multilayered diamond-like carbon coating prepared by pulse biased arc ion plating", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010901), vol. 10, no. 9-10, ISSN 0925-9635, pages 1850 - 1854, XP004321135 [A] 1-11 * page 1851, column LEFT, paragraph 3 - column RIGHT, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-9635(01)00458-7 | [A] - LEE H Y ET AL, "Structure and properties of WC-CrAlN superlattice films by cathodic arc ion plating process", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20021202), vol. 420-421, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 414 - 420, XP004397882 [A] 1-11 * page 415, column LEFT, paragraph 2 - column RIGHT, paragraph 1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(02)00813-1 | by applicant | JPH04276062 |