EP1768371 - Method for arbitrating audio signal output [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City Taoyuan County 330 / TW | [2010/22] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states High Tech Computer Corp. No. 23, Hsin Hua Rd. Taoyuan City Taoyuan Hsien / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, John C. No. 23, Hsin Hua Road Taoyuan Hsien Taoyuan City / TW | [2014/03] |
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
Wang, John C. No. 23, Hsin Hua Road, Taoyuan Hsien Taoyuan City / TW | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06121083.7 | 22.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | CN20051108957 | 23.09.2005 Original published format: CN200510108957 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1768371 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1768371 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1768371 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M19/04 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
H04M19/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | H04M9/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/44] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Arbitrierung von einem Audioausgangssignal | [2007/13] | English: | Method for arbitrating audio signal output | [2007/13] | French: | Méthode pour arbitrer un signal de sortie audio | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 27.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5694467 (YOUNG III FRANCIS A [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 6 - line 41 * * column 2, line 50 - column 5, line 26 ** column 5, line 46 - line 50 *; | [X]WO0070779 (LEE KI CHANG [KR]) [X] 1-16 * page 1, line 29 - line 11 * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 12 * * page 7, line 7 - line 34 * * page 9, line 26 - line 36 *; | [X]EP1109377 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,5,9,13 * paragraphs [0014] , [0019] , [0020] *; | [A]EP1111885 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0008] , [0011] - [0014] *; | [X]US2005058266 (KRAUSE KEVIN R [US]) [X] 1,5,9,13 * paragraphs [0007] , [0026] * |