EP1905839 - Method for the fermentative production of proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dassler, Tobias, Dr. Himalajastrasse 14 81825 München / DE | 02 /
Wich, Günter, Dr. Haseneystrasse 17 81377 München / DE | 03 /
Reutter-Maier, Anneliese Hirschenweg 10 85614 Kirchseeon / DE | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2019/28] |
Former [2008/14] | Potten, Holger, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06121094.4 | 22.09.2006 | [2008/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905839 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1905839 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1905839 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/02, C07K14/245, C12N1/21 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
C12P21/02 (EP,US);
C07K14/56 (EP,US);
C07K16/36 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C12N9/1074 (EP,US);
C12Y204/01019 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/28] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur fermentativen Herstellung von Proteinen | [2008/14] | English: | Method for the fermentative production of proteins | [2008/14] | French: | Procédé de production de protéines fermentative | [2008/14] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 22.09.2006 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.08.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.09.2011
11.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE LONZA LTD Lonzastrasse 3930 Visp / CH Opponent's representative Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Austrasse 24 4051 Basel / CH | [2014/47] |
Former [2012/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.09.2011
11.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE LONZA LTD Lonzastrasse 3930 Visp / CH Opponent's representative Schöllhorn, Andreas Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Aeschenvorstadt 55 4051 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2011/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.09.2011
LONZA LTD Lonzastrasse 3930 Visp / CH Opponent's representative Schöllhorn, Andreas Katzarov SA Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Claraplatz 1 4058 Basel / CH | 31.10.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.04.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.01.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.05.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 17.03.2014 | Appeal received No. T0654/14 | 19.05.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.01.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 30.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.12.2010 | CZ | 29.12.2010 | EE | 29.12.2010 | FI | 29.12.2010 | HU | 29.12.2010 | IE | 29.12.2010 | LT | 29.12.2010 | LV | 29.12.2010 | PL | 29.12.2010 | RO | 29.12.2010 | SI | 29.12.2010 | SK | 29.12.2010 | TR | 29.12.2010 | BG | 29.03.2011 | GR | 30.03.2011 | ES | 09.04.2011 | IS | 29.04.2011 | PT | 29.04.2011 | AT | 22.09.2011 | LU | 22.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | SE | 23.09.2015 | [2016/23] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
HU | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
AT | 22.09.2011 | ||
LU | 22.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
IE | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
TR | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
AT | 22.09.2011 | ||
LU | 22.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
RO | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
PL | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
SK | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
CZ | 29.12.2010 | ||
EE | 29.12.2010 | ||
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
GR | 30.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
IS | 29.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
ES | 09.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 29.12.2010 | |
FI | 29.12.2010 | ||
LT | 29.12.2010 | ||
LV | 29.12.2010 | ||
SI | 29.12.2010 | ||
BG | 29.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 29.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0448093 (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND [DE]) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DX]US5223482 (SCHILLING JR JAMES W [US], et al) [DX] 1-15 * column 16, line 3 - line 34 * * examples 9,10 * * figure 16 *; | [DX] - MORISHITA HIDEAKI ET AL, "Novel factor Xa and plasma kallikrein inhibitory-activities of the second Kunitz-type inhibitory domain of urinary trypsin inhibitor", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, TARRYTOWN, NY, US, (1994), vol. 73, no. 3-4, ISSN 0049-3848, pages 193 - 204, XP002411680 [DX] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0049-3848(94)90098-1 | [A] - ZHANG W-Y ET AL, "Alterations of the carboxyl-terminal amino acid residues of Escherichia coli lipoprotein affect the formation of murein-bound lipoprotein", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (19920925), vol. 267, no. 27, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 19560 - 19564, XP002411681 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * the whole document * | [DA] - MERGULHAO F J M ET AL, "Recombinant protein secretion in Escherichia coli", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, GB, (200505), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0734-9750, pages 177 - 202, XP004780594 [DA] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biotechadv.2004.11.003 | [A] - SHOKRI A ET AL, "Cell and process design for targeting of recombinant protein into the culture medium of Escherichia coli.", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200302), vol. 60, no. 6, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 654 - 664, XP002420713 [A] 1-15 * page 657, column RIGHT - page 658, column LEFT * | Examination | - HIROTA Y ET AL, "On the process of cellular division in Escherichia coli: a mutant of E. coli lacking a murein-lipoprotein.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA APR 1977 LNKD- PUBMED:323852, (197704), vol. 74, no. 4, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1417 - 1420 | - SANCHEZ A ET AL, "Synthesis in Escherichia coli of the HTLV-I trans-acting protein p40", (19871201), vol. 161, no. 2, pages 555 - 560, XP023046791 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(87)90151-6 |