EP1772920 - Fuel Cell and Fuel Cell System [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
An, Seong-Jin c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 428-5 G Kyunggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Hee-Tak c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 428-5 G Kyunggi-do / KR | 03 /
Shin, Seung-Shik c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu Kyunggi-do / KR | 04 /
Eun, Yeong-Chan c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 428-5 G Kyunggi-do / KR | 05 /
Kweon, Ho-Jin c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 428-5 G Kyunggi-do / KR | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06121381.5 | 27.09.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | KR20050090432 | 28.09.2005 Original published format: KR 20050090432 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772920 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772920 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1772920 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/02, H01M8/24, H01M8/10 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H01M8/0263 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/0228 (EP,US);
H01M8/0247 (EP,US);
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
H01M8/2485 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/47] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brennstoffzelle und Brennstoffzellenanalage | [2007/15] | English: | Fuel Cell and Fuel Cell System | [2007/15] | French: | Pile à combustible et système de piles à combustible | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 13.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1349227 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-32 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044] *; | [X]EP1357627 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-10,28-32 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]EP1429406 (SFC SMART FUEL CELL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-32 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0069] *; | [A]EP1513211 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 28,32* paragraph [0029] * | by applicant | EP1357627 |