EP1781041 - JPEG detectors and JPEG image history estimators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bressan, Marco 6 Chemin De Maubec 38700 La Tronche / FR | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06121607.3 | 02.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | US20050242580 | 03.10.2005 Original published format: US 242580 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1781041 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1781041 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1781041 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/30 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
H04N19/865 (EP,US);
H04N1/41 (KR);
G06T1/00 (KR);
G06T7/00 (KR);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/527 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/13] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | JPEG Detektoren und Schätzung der JPEG Bildhistorie | [2007/18] | English: | JPEG detectors and JPEG image history estimators | [2007/18] | French: | Détecteurs de JPEG et estimateurs de l'histoire d'images JPEG | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 19.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2011 | 10.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0769878 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3 * page 1, line 11 - page 3, line 27; figures 4,5a,5b * * page 5, line 39 - page 7, line 24 * * page 9, line 47 - line 49 *; | [A]EP1001608 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 1 *; | [Y]EP1017239 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0041]; claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO0120912 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2002191701 (O'BRIEN ROYAL [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0118] *; | [Y]US6697107 (HAMILTON JR JOHN F [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 1, line 18 - line 61; claims 1,2 *; | [XY] - NEELAMANI R ET AL, "JPEG compression history estimation for color images", PROCEEDINGS 2003 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP-2003. BARCELONA, SPAIN, SEPT. 14 - 17, 2003, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030914), VOL. 2 OF 3, ISBN 0-7803-7750-8, pages 245 - 248, XP010670336 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4 | [A] - ALGAZI V R ET AL, "IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF CODED STILL IMAGES BY POST-PROCESSING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (19960131), vol. 2663, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 168 - 176, XP000770126 [A] 1-10 * page 169, line 1 - page 170, line 15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.233030 |