EP1773092 - ENCLOSURE WITH SEALING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/15] | Enclosure with sealing arrangement | ||
[2019/17] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gealan Formteile GmbH Hofer Strasse 72-74 95145 Oberkotzau / DE | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laubmann, Gerhard Linden, 4 95119 Naila / DE | 02 /
Saunus, Christian Krumme Strasse, 12 08223 Grünbach / DE | 03 /
Ziegler, Gerhard Hildenbach, 26 95632 Wunsiedel / DE | 04 /
Rudolph, Michael Wittelsbacher Strasse, 21 95100 Selb / DE | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/15] | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06121753.5 | 04.10.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | DE20051047412 | 04.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005047412 | [2007/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1773092 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1773092 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/02 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H04R1/02 (EP);
H04R1/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE MIT DICHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2019/17] | English: | ENCLOSURE WITH SEALING ARRANGEMENT | [2019/17] | French: | ENCEINTE AVEC DISPOSITIF D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2019/17] |
Former [2007/15] | Gehäuse mit Dichtungseinrichtung | ||
Former [2007/15] | Enclosure with sealing arrangement | ||
Former [2007/15] | Enceinte avec dispositif d'étanchéité | Examination procedure | 20.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4439461 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10018344 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0152599 (SAI AUTOMOTIVE USA SAL INC [US]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [X]EP1407934 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0016] - [0021] - [0026] - [0040]; figures 2,7,8 * | Examination | DE2709205 | US4323138 | US4602382 | EP0280162 | DE3820244 | US6104823 | US6389147 | WO2004089036 | EP1487234 | WO2005068152 |