EP1908382 - Edible product containing cartridge and suitable broiling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TURCO, M. Salvator Rue Sainry 197B 4870 Trooz / BE | For all designated states Braun, Eric Albert Germain avenue Bois le Comte, 2C 4140 Gomzé-Andoumont / BE | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURCO, Salvator Rue Sainry, 197B 4870, Trooz / BE | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Intellectual Property House, Brussels Airport Business Park Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 06121815.2 | 05.10.2006 | [2008/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908382 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/04 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
A47J37/043 (EP);
A47J37/049 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/51] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kartusche mit essbarem Produkt und Kochvorrichtung dafür | [2008/15] | English: | Edible product containing cartridge and suitable broiling device | [2008/15] | French: | Cartouche alimentaire et dispositif de cuisson mettant en oeuvre une telle cartouche | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 17.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB167283 (DEMATTEIS BROILER SYSTEM COMPA) [Y] 10-15 * page 3, lines 54-71; figure 5 *; | [Y]US4393090 (CORONEOS JAMES H [US]) [Y] 15* column 6, lines 13-21; figure 3 *; | [YA]FR2786382 (BRY LIONEL [FR]) [Y] 10-15 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, lines 1-8 * * page 3, line 24 * * page 5, lines 24-33 * [A] 1-9 |