EP1783197 - Lubricating oil compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineum International Limited PO Box 1 Milton Hill Business and Technology Centre Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Infineum International Limited PO Box 1 Milton Hill Business and Technology Centre Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chu, Chin, c/o INFINEUM USA L.P. 1900 E.Linden Avenue, PO Box 710 Linden, NJ 07036 / US | 02 /
Hartley, Rolfe John, c/o INFINEUM USA L.P. 1900 E. Linden Avenue, PO Box 710 Linden, NJ 07036 / US | 03 /
Briggs, Stuart c/o INFINEUM USA L.P. 1900 E. Linden Avenue, PO Box 710 Linden, NJ 07036 / US | 04 /
Emert, Jacob, c/o INFINEUM USA L.P. 1900 E. Linden Avenue, PO Box 710 Linden, NJ 07036 / US | 05 /
Bansai, Jai G. c/o INFINEUM USA L.P. 1900 E. Linden Avenue PO Box 710 Linden, NJ 07036 / US | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Hart, Richard Joseph, et al Infineum UK Ltd. Law Department Milton Hill P.O. Box 1 Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/30] | Goddard, Frances Anna, et al Infineum UK Limited PO Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | ||
Former [2007/19] | Goddard, Frances Anna, et al Infineum UK Limited, PO Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 06121850.9 | 05.10.2006 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | US20050266789 | 04.11.2005 Original published format: US 266789 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1783197 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1783197 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1783197 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C10M157/00, C10M143/00, // C10N30/02, C10N40/25 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
C10M143/00 (EP,US);
C10M161/00 (EP,US);
C10M169/041 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2205/022 (EP,US);
C10M2205/026 (EP,US);
C10M2205/028 (EP,US);
C10M2205/04 (EP,US);
C10M2205/08 (EP,US);
C10M2207/14 (EP,US);
C10M2207/262 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10M2229/02 (EP,US);
C10N2020/019 (EP,US);
C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,US);
C10N2030/40 (EP,US);
C10N2030/42 (EP,US);
C10N2030/43 (EP,US);
C10N2030/45 (EP,US);
C10N2030/68 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/252 (EP,US);
C10N2040/253 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2205/022, C10M2205/024 (EP,US);
C10M2205/04, C10M2205/06 (US,EP);
C10M2205/04, C10M2205/06, C10N2060/02 (US,EP);
C10M2223/045, C10N2010/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2007/19] | C10M157/00, // C10N30/02, C10N40/25 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schmierölzusammensetzungen | [2007/19] | English: | Lubricating oil compositions | [2007/19] | French: | Compositions d'huiles lubrifiantes | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2006 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | IE | 05.10.2018 | LU | 05.10.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 05.10.2006 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 05.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]US4194057 (BRANKLING DAVID [GB], et al) [XD] 1-5 * column 2, line 3 - line 65 * * column 7, line 10 - line 15 * * claim - * [I] 1-10; | [A]EP1398365 (INFINEUM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0085] , [0130] ** table 2 *; | [IDA]WO2004087849 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [ID] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] , [0084] , [0092] , [0095] , [0096] , [0100] * * claim - * [A] 12-13 |