EP1775553 - Hybrid centered head-down aircraft attitude display and method for calculating displayed drift angle limit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2012/15] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. P O Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
He, Gang / 1 Pletcher Place Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2012/15] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
He, Gang 1 Pletcher Place Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhourse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1EW / GB | ||
Former [2007/16] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06121880.6 | 06.10.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | US20050249237 | 12.10.2005 Original published format: US 249237 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775553 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1775553 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01C23/00 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
G01C23/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hybride zentrierte Fluglagenanzeige mit Blickrichtung nach unten und Verfahren zur Berechnung des angezeigten Abdriftwinkellimits | [2007/16] | English: | Hybrid centered head-down aircraft attitude display and method for calculating displayed drift angle limit | [2007/16] | French: | Viseur d'attitude d'aéronef tête basse centré hybride et procédé de calcul de la limite d'angle de dérive affichée | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 27.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1209922 (KAISER AEROSPACE & ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1,5,8* the whole document *; | [A]US5745054 (WILKENS DEAN RICHARD [US]) [A] 1,5,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003132860 (FEYEREISEN THEA L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0043] , [0068] , [0166] - [0186]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2004160341 (FEYEREISEN THEA L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] - [0083]; figures 2-4 * |