EP1758384 - Apparatus and method for visualizing operational states of Audio/video devices or the content flow therebetween. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Dong-seok 46-37 Samsung-dong Gangnam-Gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Park, Se-hyun 114-406 Daelim Apartment Daebang-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Gu, Sun-young 404-46 Jinkwanoe-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Kim, Na-young 101-301, Taeyoung Apt. 530-1 Pungdeokcheon 2-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Brandon, Paul Laurence Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Brandon, Paul Laurence APPLEYARD LEES 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06122120.6 | 10.10.2005 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | KR20040083868 | 20.10.2004 Original published format: KR 20040083868 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758384 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N7/24, H04L12/24 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
H04N21/4135 (EP,US);
G11B19/02 (KR);
H04B1/205 (EP,US);
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/44] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Anzeige des Betriebszustands von Audio-Video-Geräten oder des Inhaltsflusses zwischen denen | [2007/09] | English: | Apparatus and method for visualizing operational states of Audio/video devices or the content flow therebetween. | [2007/09] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour l'affichage de l'état opérationnel d'appareils Audio-Vidéo ou du flux de contenu entre eux | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/43] | 13.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05256286.5 / EP1650962 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050256286) is 06.06.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5883621 (IWAMURA RYUICHI [US]) [X] 1-40 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 1 * * column 4, lines 15-26 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 5 * * column 8, lines 18-32 * * column 8, lines 57-64 * * figure 1 * * figure 2b * * figure 12 *; | [X]US6738101 (UTSUNOMIYA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,17,23,29,35 * abstract * * column 3, lines 48-61 * * column 22, line 63 - column 23, line 5 ** figure 9 * | Examination | EP0535749 | US5793366 | WO9906910 | EP1377050 | by applicant | US5883621 | US6738101 |