EP1775415 - Roller shutter box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veka AG Dieselstrasse 8 48324 Sendenhorst / DE | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drees, Ulrich Hoetmarer Strasse 73 48324 Sendenhorst / DE | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Tarvenkorn, Oliver, et al Tarvenkorn & Wickord Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bernhard-Ernst-Straße 12 48155 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Tarvenkorn, Oliver, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Tarvenkorn Hafenweg 14 48155 Münster / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Tarvenkorn, Oliver, et al SPIEKER & JAEGER Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Hafenweg 14 48155 Münster / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | Tarvenkorn, Oliver Patentanwälte, Dr. Hoffmeister & Tarvenkorn, Postfach 3828 48021 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 06122270.9 | 13.10.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | DE20052016057U | 13.10.2005 Original published format: DE 202005016057 U | [2007/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1775415 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1775415 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | [2010/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1775415 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/17 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
E06B9/17007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | Aufsatz-Rollladenkasten | [2007/16] | English: | Roller shutter box | [2007/16] | French: | Caisson de volet roulant | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 18.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.05.2011 | CZ | 25.05.2011 | DK | 25.05.2011 | EE | 25.05.2011 | FI | 25.05.2011 | HU | 25.05.2011 | IE | 25.05.2011 | LT | 25.05.2011 | LV | 25.05.2011 | NL | 25.05.2011 | PL | 25.05.2011 | RO | 25.05.2011 | SE | 25.05.2011 | SI | 25.05.2011 | SK | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | BG | 25.08.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | IS | 25.09.2011 | PT | 26.09.2011 | AT | 13.10.2011 | GB | 13.10.2011 | LU | 13.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
AT | 13.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.10.2011 | ||
LU | 13.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
AT | 13.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.10.2011 | ||
LU | 13.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
AT | 13.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.10.2011 | ||
LU | 13.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
AT | 13.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
GB | 13.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
PT | 26.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0643192 (SOPROFEN S A [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE10212294 (ELKET ROLLADENSYSTEME BESLER G [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [E]EP1736631 (THYSSEN POLYMER GMBH [DE]) [E] 1 * figures 1,5 * | by applicant | EP0643192 |