EP1777591 - High gloss emulsion aggregation toner incorporating aluminized silica as a coagulating agent and method of making said toner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patel, Raj D. / 2051 Pen Street Oakville Ontario L6H 3L2 / CA | 02 /
Vanbesien, Daryl W. / 2249 Pathfinder Drive Burlington Ontario L7L 6L6 / CA | 03 /
Sanders, David J. / 273 Pettit Court Oakville Ontario L6H 5K8 / CA | 04 /
Chen, Allan K. / 1022 Riverbank Way Oakville Ontario L6H 6X1 / CA | [2012/04] |
Former [2007/17] | 01 /
Patel, Raj D. 2051 Pen Street Oakville Ontario L6H 3L2 / CA | ||
02 /
Vanbesien, Daryl W. 2249 Pathfinder Drive Burlington Ontario L7L 6L6 / CA | |||
03 /
Sanders, David J. 273 Pettit Court Oakville Ontario L6H 5K8 / CA | |||
04 /
Chen, Allan K. 1022 Riverbank Way Oakville Ontario L6H 6X1 / CA | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M., et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Jones, Helen M.M., et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06122385.5 | 16.10.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | US20050250568 | 17.10.2005 Original published format: US 250568 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777591 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777591 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/093, G03G9/08, G03G9/087 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G03G9/0819 (EP,US);
G03G9/08 (KR);
G03G9/0806 (EP,US);
G03G9/0821 (EP,US);
G03G9/087 (KR);
G03G9/08708 (EP,US);
G03G9/08711 (EP,US);
G03G9/08728 (EP,US);
G03G9/08795 (EP,US);
G03G9/08797 (EP,US);
G03G9/09 (KR);
G03G9/09321 (EP,US);
G03G9/09342 (EP,US);
G03G9/09364 (EP,US);
G03G9/09385 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/01] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Emulsion Aggregations Toner mit aluminisiertem Silica als Koagulationsmittel un Herstellungsprozess | [2007/17] | English: | High gloss emulsion aggregation toner incorporating aluminized silica as a coagulating agent and method of making said toner | [2007/17] | French: | Toner à agrégation d'émulsion contenant de la silice aluminée comme agent coagulant et son procédé de fabrication | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YX]US6416920 (HOPPER MICHAEL A [CA], et al) [Y] 1,3-11 * abstract * * column 7, lines 7-10 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 44 * * example 1 * * claims 1,2,8,9,19 * * column 15, lines 26-62 * [X] 2; | [Y]US2004265727 (VANBESIEN DARYL [CA], et al) [Y] 1,3-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] * * examples 1-7 *; | [A]US6326117 (ISHIHARA TORU [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | Examination | US5928830 | by applicant | US6120967 | US6416920 |