EP1760720 - Write-once-type recording medium, recording apparatus and method for the same, reproducing apparatus and method for the same, and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | ||
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Masayoshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | 02 /
Koda, Takeshi c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Works 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06122700.5 | 16.03.2005 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | JP20040082527 | 22.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004082527 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1760720 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1760720 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B27/00, G11B27/32, G11B27/10 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (KR);
G11B20/1251 (EP,US);
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B2020/10861 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1873 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1893 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/237 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/10] | G11B27/32, G11B27/10, G11B20/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einmal beschreibbares Aufzeichnungsmedium, Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung und Verfahren dafür, Wiedergabevorrichtung und Verfahren dafür, und Computerprogramm | [2007/10] | English: | Write-once-type recording medium, recording apparatus and method for the same, reproducing apparatus and method for the same, and computer program | [2007/10] | French: | Support d'enregistrement de type non réinscriptible, appareil et procédé d'enregistrement de celui-ci, appareil et procédé de reproduction correspondants, et programme informatique | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LV | 11.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.01.2011 | 25.01.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/24] | 06.02.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05720874.6 / EP1744317 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050720874) is 23.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03030173 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,3,4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [XA]KR20040023127 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 4 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5-7; | [PXL]WO2004077433 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [PXL] 1,3-7 *From the same applicant: doubts on priority claimed *; | [PX]WO2004077415 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [PX] 1 * figures 5,7-12 *; | [PX]WO2004081922 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [PX] 1,3-5 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1505597 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 1,3-7 * figures 3,9,14,15 * * paragraph [0208] - paragraph [0210] * * paragraph [0223] - paragraph [0244] *; | [E]WO2005073971 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [E] 1,2 * the whole document *; | US2006117241 [ ] (KO JUNG-WAN [KR], et al); | US2006156056 [ ] (YOSHIDA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0137] *; | [PX] - ANONYMOUS, "White paper Blu-ray Disc Format, 1.B Physical Format Specifications for BD-R", WHITE PAPER BLU-RAY DISC, BLU-RAY DISC FOUNDERS, US, (200408), pages 1 - 33, XP002324152 [PX] 1,3 * page 31 - page 33 * |