EP1780489 - Header box for heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES SAS Branche Thermique Habitacle Propriété Industrielle 8, rue Louis-Lormand BP 513 La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE DUC, Gaël 6, Chemin Bas 72230, Guezezard / FR | 02 /
BERTHOME, Bruno 77, rue Notre Dame des Champs 75006 Paris / FR | 03 /
BIGOT, Olivier 33bis, Route de Fillé 72700, Spay / FR | [2007/22] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
LE DUC, Gaël 6, Chemin Bas 72230, Guezezard / FR | ||
02 /
BERTHOME, Bruno 9, rue Dulcie September 72100, Le Mans / FR | |||
03 /
BIGOT, Olivier 33bis, Route de Fillé 72700, Spay / FR | Representative(s) | Léveillé, Christophe Valeo Systemes Thermiques Service Propriété Industrielle Branche Thermique Habitacle 8, rue Louis Lormand, La Verrière BP 513 78321 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Léveillé, Christophe Valeo Systemes Thermiques Service Propriété Industrielle Branche Thermique Habitacle 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière BP 513 78321 Le Mesnil-Saint- Denis Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/01] | Léveillé, Christophe VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES Branche Thermique Habitacle 8 Rue Louis Lormand La Verrière BP 513 78321 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06122903.5 | 25.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | FR20050011133 | 28.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0511133 | [2007/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1780489 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
F28F9/0278 (EP);
F28D1/05391 (EP);
F28F9/0214 (EP);
F28F9/0224 (EP);
F28F9/182 (EP);
F28D2021/0085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | Sammelkasten für Wärmetauscher | [2007/18] | English: | Header box for heat exchanger | [2007/18] | French: | Boîte collectrice pour échangeur de chaleur | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/37] | 30.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2793016 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,9,14,15,17,18 * page 4, lines 31-35 * * page 5, line 33 - page 7, line 24; figures 1,2 * * claims 1,5 * [Y] 3,4,6-8,10,16,19; | [YA]WO0150080 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR], et al) [Y] 3,4,6-8,10,19 * page 1, lines 9-13 * * page 6, line 31 - page 9, line 3; figures 1-3; claims 1,5-7 * [A] 1,2,5,9,17,18; | [Y]FR2844346 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [Y] 16 * abstract *; | [XA]FR2851331 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [X] 1,9,14,15,17,18 * page 1, line 7 - page 2, line 5 * * page 6, line 31 - page 8, line 36; figures 5-8 * * page 12, line 17 - page 13, line 25; figures 14,15 * [A] 11,19; | [Y]US2003188857 (KAWAKUBO MASAAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,7-9,11-15,17,18 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0052]; figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0070]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0075] - [0080]; figures 6-8 *; | [DY]EP0563471 (MODINE MFG CO [US]) [DY] 1,7-9,11-15,17,18 * page 6, line 40 - page 8, line 12; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2003155109 (KAWAKUBO MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7-9,11-15,17-19 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0081]; figures 12-15 * |