EP1788705 - Voting scheme for analog signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erstad, David O. 512 Milbert Road Minnetonka, MN 55305 / US | 02 /
Ohme, Bruce W. 5121 17th Avenue So. Minneapolis, MN 55305 / US | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhourse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1EW / GB | ||
Former [2007/21] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06122955.5 | 25.10.2006 | [2007/21] | Priority number, date | US20050262081 | 27.10.2005 Original published format: US 262081 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1788705 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1788705 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/1252, G01R19/00 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
H03K5/1252 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/21] | H03K5/1252 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2009/28] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abstimmungsschaltung für analoge Signale | [2007/21] | English: | Voting scheme for analog signals | [2007/21] | French: | Circuit voteur pour signaux analogiques | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 17.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3412261 (HICKIN CHARLES W R, et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US4707621 (ARITA SETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US6040718 (HENRY PAUL M [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0625755 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002060585 (DOYLE BRENT R [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3412261 | US6040718 | EP0625755 |