EP1791139 - Inductive component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zarlink Semiconductor Limited Cheney Manor Swindon Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wotherspoon, Tracy 46 Tree Tops Portskewett, NP26 5RT / GB | 02 /
Coombs, Tim 58 Rhiwbina Hill Cardiff, CF14 6UQ / GB | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06123147.8 | 30.10.2006 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | GB20050023969 | 25.11.2005 Original published format: GB 0523969 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1791139 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01F17/00 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
H01F17/0013 (EP,US);
H01F2021/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/06] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Induktives Bauelement | [2007/22] | English: | Inductive component | [2007/22] | French: | Composant inductif | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/26] | 10.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003222750 (KYRIAZIDOU CHRYSSOULA [US]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0030] - [0032]; figure 5 *; | [X]US5497337 (PONNAPALLI SAILA [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 2, lines 31-67; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2005052272 (TIEBOUT MARC [DE]) [A] 6 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2005024178 (ANCEY PASCAL [FR], et al) [A] 6 * paragraphs [0022] - [0039]; figures 2-7 *; | [A]US2004140528 (KIM CHEON SOO [KR], et al) [A] 6 * paragraphs [0032] - [0041]; figures 4-6 * * paragraph [0053]; figure 10 *; | [A]EP0550974 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 11 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 39; figure 1 * |