EP1780682 - Moiré-based autostereoscopic watermarks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Shen-Ge 9 Selborne Chase Fairport, NY 14450 / US | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06123174.2 | 30.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | US20050263368 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: US 263368 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1780682 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/12, G02B27/60, G02B27/22, G09C5/00 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
B42D25/342 (EP,US);
G02B27/60 (EP,US);
G02B30/27 (US);
G07D7/0032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/02] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Moiré-basierte autostereoskopische Wasserzeichen | [2007/18] | English: | Moiré-based autostereoscopic watermarks | [2007/18] | French: | Filigranes autostéréoscopiques à Moiré | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.04.2011 | 07.04.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/36] | 30.04.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004076310 (HERSCH ROGER D [CH], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0177] * * paragraph [0231] * * figure 3 *; | [A]GB2167879 (PENNANT DISPLAY & EXHIBITION L) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 61 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE102004007379 (OVD KINEGRAM AG ZUG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |