EP1785629 - Rotary compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Kazuya Matsubarahaitsu-royal 201 2-14-14 Nishikoizumi Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma-ken / JP | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06123285.6 | 31.10.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | JP20050324235 | 09.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005324235 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1785629 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1785629 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/356, F04C27/00, F04C29/06, F04C23/00 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
F04C27/005 (EP,US);
F04C29/00 (KR);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F04C29/065 (EP,US);
F04C29/068 (EP,US);
F04C18/3564 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | F04C18/356, F04C27/00, F04C29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2012/37] |
Former [2007/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rotationsverdichter | [2007/20] | English: | Rotary compressor | [2007/20] | French: | Compresseur rotatif | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 05.07.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.08.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 30.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4636154 (SUGIYAMA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8 [I] 8; | [XI]US2764342 (DILLS RAYMOND L) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [I] 8; | [XI]US3130902 (BROWN CLARENCE H) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [I] 8; | [Y]US2005191198 (SATO KAZUYA [JP]) [Y] 7,8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2003097473 |