EP1743823 - Drive for a working vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofer, Jürgen Schulstr. 23 66501, Großbundenbach / DE | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06123361.5 | 23.03.2005 | [2007/03] | Priority number, date | DE20041016242 | 02.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004016242 | [2007/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1743823 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1743823 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/08, B60T7/08, B60K17/10, F16H61/46, // B60W10/10, B60W10/18 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
B60K17/10 (EP,US);
B60W10/103 (EP,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,US);
B60W30/18109 (EP,US);
F16H61/4157 (EP,US);
F16H61/421 (EP,US);
B60T2201/04 (EP,US);
B60W2520/26 (EP,US);
B60W2520/28 (EP,US);
B60W2540/106 (EP,US);
F16H2059/506 (EP,US);
F16H59/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/38] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antriebssystem eines Arbeitsfahrzeugs | [2007/03] | English: | Drive for a working vehicle | [2007/03] | French: | Entraînement pour véhicule de travail | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 29.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05102335.6 / EP1582389 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 28.05.2008 | [2008/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19607048 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 13 *; | [A]DE2947552 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1 * page 11, paragraph 2; figure . *; | [A]US4301901 (JENSEN LOUIS T) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0706466 (LUEPGES PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DA]EP1223069 (BRUENINGHAUS HYDROMATIK GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |