EP1764966 - Data transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerendai, Magdolna Lorantffy Zs. U 13 1043, Budapest / HU | 02 /
Toth, Mihály Örs u. 12 1183 Budapest / HU | 03 /
Paller, Gábor Attila u. 86 1047 Budapest / HU | [2007/17] |
Former [2007/12] | 01 /
Gerendai, Magdolna Lorantffy Zs. U 13 1043, Budapest / HU | ||
02 /
Toth, Mihály Kende Kanuth u. 67 1204, Budapest / HU | |||
03 /
Paller, Gábor Attila u. 86 1147, Budapest / HU | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2007/12] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 12 B 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 06123862.2 | 07.11.2000 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | FI19990002470 | 17.11.1999 Original published format: FI 992470 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1764966 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/66, H04Q7/22, H04L12/40 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L1/1635 (EP,US);
H04L69/166 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04W68/00 (EP,US);
H04W88/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/12] | Title | German: | Datenübertragung | [2007/12] | English: | Data transmission | [2007/12] | French: | Transmission de données | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 05.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/51] | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00976100.8 / EP1232615 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000976100) is 03.11.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9634374 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-37 * abstract *; | [A]EP0770962 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,32-37 * the whole document * | [X] - Wireless Transaction Protocol Specification, WAP WTP WIRELESS APPLICATION PROTOCOL FORUM - 1998, (19980430), XP002901533 [X] 1-37 * page 1 - page 71 * * the whole document * | [X] - KHARE R, "Effect Considered Harmful", EFFECT CONSIDERED HARMFUL, (19990409), pages 1 - 17, URL: www.4k-associates.com/IEEE-L7-WAP-BIG.html, (20010201), XP002901534 [X] 1-37 * page 1 - page 8 * | [X] - WAP WHITE PAPER, AU-SYSTEM RADIO, (199902), pages 1 - 22, XP002901535 [X] 1-37 * the whole document * | [X] - "Wireless Application Protocol WDP and WCMP Adaptation for access of a WAP Proxy Server to a Wireless Data Gateway", WDP AND WCMP WIRELESS DATA GATEWAY ADAPTATION, (19991105), pages 1 - 31, XP002901536 [X] 1-37 * the whole document * |