EP1757281 - Formulation for inhalation comprising a glucocorticoid and a beta 2-adrenoreceptor agonist [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biggadike, Keith GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 02 /
Jones, Paul GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 03 /
Payne, Jeremy, John GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Pritchard, Judith GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Pritchard, Judith GlaxoSmithKline, Corporate Intellectual Property (CN925.1), 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 06124055.2 | 04.02.2003 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | US20020066961 | 04.02.2002 Original published format: US 66961 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1757281 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1757281 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/72, A61K31/18, A61K31/58, A61P11/06 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
A61K9/0075 (EP);
A61K31/18 (EP);
A61K31/573 (EP);
A61K31/58 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K9/008 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/58, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | LT | 14.11.2006 | LV | 14.11.2006 | RO | 14.11.2006 | Title | German: | Zubereitung zur Inhalation enthaltend ein Glucocorticoid und einen Beta 2-Adrenorezeptor Agonisten | [2007/09] | English: | Formulation for inhalation comprising a glucocorticoid and a beta 2-adrenoreceptor agonist | [2007/09] | French: | Formulation pour inhalation comprenant un glucocorticoïde et un agoniste de 2-adrénorécepteur béta | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/07] | 27.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03702732.3 / EP1471895 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PYD]WO0212266 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PYD] 1-23 * page 1, line 3 - page 5, line 12 * * page 9, line 20 - page 11, line 14 * * page 13, line 21 - line 34 * * claim 1 *; | [PYD]WO02066422 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PYD] 1-23 * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 14 * * page 7, line 33 - line 38 * * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 25 * * page 12, line 9 - page 13, line 3 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0416951 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] * example 1 *; | [A]WO0048587 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] * example 1 * |