EP1788194 - Apparatus for cooling gas turbine engine components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/21] | Methods and apparatus for cooling combustion turbine engine components | ||
[2015/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2016/16] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
West, James Anthony 301 Gunnison Drive Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 02 /
Kvasnak, William Stephen 8 Ipswick Lane Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | 03 /
Sexton, Brendan Francis 30 Willow Oak Court Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Lee, Brenda GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2016/16] |
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/21] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06124339.0 | 17.11.2006 | [2007/21] | Priority number, date | US20050282348 | 18.11.2005 Original published format: US 282348 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1788194 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1788194 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1788194 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D9/02, F02C7/18, F02C3/14 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
F01D9/047 (EP,US);
F01D11/001 (EP,US);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D9/065 (EP,US);
F02C3/14 (EP,US);
F02C6/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/21] | F01D5/18, F01D9/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2014/49] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Apparat zur Kühlung von Komponenten einer Gasturbine | [2015/50] | English: | Apparatus for cooling gas turbine engine components | [2015/50] | French: | Appareil pour le refroidissement des composantes des turbine à gas | [2015/50] |
Former [2007/21] | Methode und Apparat zur Kühlung von Komponenten einer Verbrennungsgasturbine | ||
Former [2007/21] | Methods and apparatus for cooling combustion turbine engine components | ||
Former [2007/21] | Méthode et appareil pour le refroidissement des composantes des turbine à gas à combustion | Examination procedure | 21.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 24.10.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5985429 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]US5591002 (CUNHA FRANCISCO J [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-10 * columns 3,8,9; figures 1,2,4-6 *; | [Y]US4173120 (GROSJEAN WILLIAM C [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-10 * column 5, lines 40-68; figures 2-8 * * columns 6,7 *; | [Y]JP2004116485 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [A]US2003167775 (SOECHTING FRIEDRICH O [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * columns 1-3; figures 1-3 * |