EP1790403 - Realistic coordinating of specific body part movements in mechanical toys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HASBRO, INC. 1027 Newport Avenue Pawtucket, Rhode Island 02862 / US | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maddocks, Richard J. 7 Copper Kettle Lane Barrington, RI 02086 / US | 02 /
Olson, Jeffrey H. 16 Ontario Street West Warick, RI02888 / US | 03 /
Hall, Peter Mellowfield, Gouch Close Beeston, Kings Lyn Norfolk PE32 2XL / GB | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2007/22] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06124392.9 | 20.11.2006 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | US20050740613P | 29.11.2005 Original published format: US 740613 P | US20060552732 | 25.10.2006 Original published format: US 552732 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790403 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63H11/18, A63H13/02 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
A63H13/02 (EP,US);
A63H11/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/06] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Realistische Koordination von spezifischen Körperteilbewegungen in mechanischen Spielsachen | [2007/22] | English: | Realistic coordinating of specific body part movements in mechanical toys | [2007/22] | French: | Coordination réaliste de mouvements d'une partie du corps spécifique dans des jouets mécaniques | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/29] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3195270 (GLASS MARVIN I, et al) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 61; figure - *; | [XA]US6120343 (MIGLIORATI SOSTENE [LU]) [X] 1,3,5,10 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 30; figure - * [A] 2,4,6-9,11,12; | [A]WO0160474 (DSLE SYSTEM S A [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 3, line 21 - page 6, line 17; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US6752683 (GODFREY THOMAS P [US]) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 32; figures 1-3,5 * |