EP1849383 - Hanger system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fryer, Kevan 16 Holcombe Drive Paraparaumu / NZ | For all designated states Houston, James P.O. Box 85 Paris, TN 38242-0085 / US | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/44] | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20, Avenue de l'Agent Sarre .B.P. 74 92700 Colombes Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06124525.4 | 22.11.2006 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | US20060412805 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: US 412805 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1849383 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849383 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47G25/06 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
A47F5/0006 (EP,US);
A47G25/0614 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3488 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Title | German: | Aufhängesystem | [2007/44] | English: | Hanger system | [2007/44] | French: | Système de suspension | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | BE | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IT | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | LV | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | IE | 22.11.2009 | LU | 22.11.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | HU | 27.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
LU | 22.11.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
LU | 22.11.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2336904 (BATTS JOHN T INC [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4957259 (WOLF JR EDWARD J [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5221012 (LICARI VITO [US]) [X] 1,4,8 * figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2003052070 (WEISENBURGER RICHARD T [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0034]; figures 8A,8B * |