EP1840053 - Workpiece transfer method, system and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Company Limited 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Setsuo Nissan Technical Centre Intellectual Property Dpt.(KV0) 560-2 Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | 02 /
Motohashi, Yuta Nissan Technical Centre Intellectual Property Dpt.(KV0) 560-2 Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | 03 /
Naito, Masayoshi Nissan Technical Centre Intellectual Property Dpt.(KV0) 560-2 Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | 04 /
Honda, Yoshiharu Nissan Technical Centre Intellectual Property Dpt.(KV0) 560-2 Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | 05 /
Masumo, Kenji Nissan Technical Centre Intellectual Property Dpt.(KV0) 560-2 Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | 06 /
Nishimaki, Shouji Nissan Technical Centre Intellectual Property Dpt.(KV0) 560-2 Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Brochard, Pascale, et al Osha Liang 32 Avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Brochard, Pascale, et al Osha Liang 32 avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/40] | Holmes, Matthew William Nissan Technical Centre Europe Ltd, Intellectual Property Department, Cranfield Technology Park Bedfordshire, MK43 0DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 06124605.4 | 22.11.2006 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20060050990 | 27.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006050990 | JP20060215567 | 08.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006215567 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840053 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840053 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/91, B65G49/06, B62D65/18 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
B65G49/068 (EP);
B65G49/061 (EP);
B65G2249/04 (EP);
B65G2249/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/24] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, System und Vorrichtung zum Transfer von Bauteilen | [2007/40] | English: | Workpiece transfer method, system and device | [2007/40] | French: | Procédé, système et dispositif de transfert de pièces | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 03.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5632590 (PEARSON THOMAS E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003113192 (RANSOM LANCE T [CA]) [A] 1,4,5,8 * paragraphs [0024] - [0030]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5632595 (MORI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 6, lines 14-57; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US5632590 | JP2000293695 |