EP1793029 - Laundry washing or drying machine with a sleeve connecting the tub to the casing and mounting method for such a sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FagorBrandt SAS 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2013/02] |
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states FagorBrandt SAS 7, rue Henri Becquerel 92500 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states Brandt Industries SAS 7, rue Henri Becquerel 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARY, Christian 15 chemin de Melat 38790 Saint Georges D'Esperanche / FR | [2007/23] | Application number, filing date | 06125000.7 | 29.11.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | FR20050012284 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: FR 0512284 | [2007/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1793029 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1793029 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/26 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
D06F37/266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | Wäschewaschmaschine oder Wäschetrockner mit einer Manschette zur Verbindung des Laugenbehälters mit dem Gehäuse und Montageverfahren für eine solche Manschette. | [2007/23] | English: | Laundry washing or drying machine with a sleeve connecting the tub to the casing and mounting method for such a sleeve | [2007/23] | French: | Machine à laver et/ou sécher le linge munie d'une manchette de liaison cuve / carrosserie et procédé d'assemblage de ladite manchette | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 01.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2006 | AT | 23.01.2013 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | NL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2450896 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]) [A] 1,12 * page 3, line 5 - line 9; figure 2 *; | [AD]FR2629488 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]) [AD] 1,12* figure 1 *; | [A]DE19856915 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1,12 * figure 2; claim 2 * | by applicant | FR2629488 | DE19856915 |