EP1793094 - Adjustable support bar for steam turbine diaphragms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Russo, Thomas Patrick 2569 Old Mill Road Galway, NY 12074 / US | 02 /
Robertson, Kenneth J. 952 County Highway 110 Broadalbin, NY 12025 / US | 03 /
Burgdick, Steven Sebastian 7006 Kevin Lane Schenectady, NY 12303 / US | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Foster, Christopher Michael General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/23] | Bedford, Grant Richard London Patent Operation GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06125094.0 | 30.11.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | US20050164603 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: US 164603 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1793094 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/24 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
F01D3/02 (EP,US);
F01D9/02 (KR);
F01D11/08 (KR);
F01D25/24 (EP,US);
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F01D9/04 (KR);
F05D2220/31 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2008/07] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einstellbare Stützstange für Dampfturbinenleitschaufelhalbschalen | [2007/23] | English: | Adjustable support bar for steam turbine diaphragms | [2007/23] | French: | Barre de support réglable pour des diaphragmes de turbine à vapeur | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.02.2016 | 23.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/38] | 19.05.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4204803 (CLIFFORD PETER P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 21; figures 3,4 * [Y] 4,7; | [X]JPH10299411 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026]; figure 3 *; | [Y]GB1188993 (TUCKER COUNCIL ABBOTT [US], et al) [Y] 4,7 * page 1, line 19 - page 1, line 28 *; | [X]EP1180581 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 5 * paragraph [0008]; figure 1 * |