EP1793399 - Holding tool and method for fixing an electronic component and circular table manufacturing unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/23] | Holding tool for fixing an electronic component and circular table manufacturing unit | ||
[2009/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMARTRAC TECHNOLOGY GERMANY GmbH Gewerbeparkstrasse 10 51580 Reichshof-Wehnrath / DE | [2010/02] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states Sokymat Automotive GmbH Gewerbeparkstrasse 10 51580 Reichshof-Wehnrath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bajahr, Frank Gronauer Waldweg 45 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
Wiskott, Ruprecht Brindöpkestrasse 4 51674 Wiehl-Bielstein / DE | 03 /
Spreng, Markus Igelschlade 18 51588 Nümbrecht / DE | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Tappe, Hartmut, et al Advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Tappe, Hartmut, et al advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6 35390 Giessen / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | Vigand, Philippe, et al ICB, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 06125350.6 | 04.12.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | EP20050111702 | 05.12.2005 Original published format: EP 05111702 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1793399 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1793399 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/06, H01F27/40 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
H01F27/40 (EP);
H01F41/076 (EP);
H01F41/092 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | Haltewerkzeug und Verfahren zum Befestigen eines elektronischen Bauteils und Rundtischherstellungseinheit | [2009/40] | English: | Holding tool and method for fixing an electronic component and circular table manufacturing unit | [2009/40] | French: | Outil de serrage et méthode permettant de fixer un composant électronique et unité de fabrication à table circulaire | [2009/40] |
Former [2007/23] | Haltewerkzeug zum Befestigen eines elektronischen Bauteils und Rundtischherstellungseinheit | ||
Former [2007/23] | Holding tool for fixing an electronic component and circular table manufacturing unit | ||
Former [2007/23] | Outil de serrage permettant de fixer un composant électronique et unité de fabrication à table circulaire | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 07.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.06.2010 | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | LT | 30.06.2010 | LV | 30.06.2010 | PL | 30.06.2010 | RO | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | TR | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | IS | 30.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | IE | 04.12.2010 | LU | 04.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | HU | 01.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BE | 30.06.2010 | |
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
TR | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
LU | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BE | 30.06.2010 | |
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
LU | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 30.06.2010 | |
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 30.06.2010 | |
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | BE | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | BE | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | BE | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | BE | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | FI | 30.06.2010 | |
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6067235 (FINN DAVID [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 65 - column 7, line 20; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5572410 (GUSTAFSON AKE [CH]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 47; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]EP0573469 (GUSTAFSON AKE [CH]); | [A]EP1471544 (METGET AB [SE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 7, line 67 - column 8, line 13; figure 1 * * column 9, lines 43-55; figure 4 * * column 10, line 58 - column 11, line 21; figures 5,6 *; | [A]DE4307080 (AMATECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] - [0048]; figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0055] - [0059]; figures 6-8 * |