EP1800978 - Wiper blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADM21 Co., Ltd. 742-6, Wonsi-dong Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 425-850 / KR | For all designated states Kim, In Kyu 5-805 Yeosulin Apt. Seongpo-dong Sangnok-Gu / KR | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, In Kyu 5-805 Yeosulin Apt Seongpo-Dong, Sangnok-Gu Ansan-Si, Gyeonggi-Do 426-768 / KR | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06125454.6 | 05.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | KR20050117621 | 05.12.2005 Original published format: KR 20050117621 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1800978 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1800978 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1800978 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38, B60S1/40 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
B60S1/38 (EP,KR,US);
B60S1/3808 (EP,US);
B60S1/3879 (EP,US);
B60S1/40 (EP,US);
B60S1/3856 (EP,US);
B60S1/3867 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Wischblatt | [2007/26] | English: | Wiper blade | [2007/26] | French: | Balai d'essuie-glace | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.02.2011 | DK | 16.02.2011 | EE | 16.02.2011 | FI | 16.02.2011 | IS | 16.02.2011 | LT | 16.02.2011 | LV | 16.02.2011 | SI | 16.02.2011 | SK | 16.02.2011 | TR | 16.02.2011 | BG | 16.05.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/33] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
DK | 16.02.2011 | ||
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.02.2011 | |
FI | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.02.2011 | |
LV | 16.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0436510 (TRICO FOLBERTH LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 4 - line 49; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE10107021 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0016]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE202004012132U (KU SHU LAN [TW]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3,4B * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] *; | [E]EP1792794 (ADM21 CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-7,9-12,14-16 * figures 3-7; claims 1-10 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0027] *; | [E]EP1800977 (ADM21 CO LTD [KR], et al) [E] 1-6,9-11,16 * figures 3-7; claims 1-3,5-7 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0028] * |