EP1795661 - Flush tank drain valve assembly with a system for regulating the amount of water drained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oliveira & Irmao S.A. Variante da Cidade Apartado 705 Esgueira 3800 Aveiro / PT | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moura De Oliviera, Antonio Manuel Fonte do Senhorio, Mataduços 3800-25 Aveiro / PT | 02 /
Lopes Dias De Figueiredo, Noé Horta Eixo 3800-716 Aveiro / PT | 03 /
Pacheco Teixeira, Pedro Miguel Rua Francisco Xavier Ataíde de Oliveira Lote 33 - R/c D 8600-775 Lagos / PT | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06125653.3 | 07.12.2006 | [2007/24] | Priority number, date | IT2005MI02354 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: IT MI20052354 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1795661 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1795661 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E03D1/14, E03D1/33 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
E03D1/144 (EP);
E03D1/33 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/35] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entleerungsventilanordnung für einen Spülkasten mit einem System zur Regelung der zu entleerenden Wassermenge | [2007/24] | English: | Flush tank drain valve assembly with a system for regulating the amount of water drained | [2007/24] | French: | Soupage d'évacuation d'un réservoir de chasse d'eau avec un système permettant d'ajuster de la quantité d'eau dechargée | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/51] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2819835 (SANITAIRE ACCESSOIRES SERVICES [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-11 * page 5, line 18 - page 10, line 12; figures 1-7; claim 7 *; | [A]EP1310603 (IDROLS SA [ES]) [A] 9-11* column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 32; figure - *; | [X]ES1058939U (FOMINAYA SA [ES]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 52; figure - * |