EP1818169 - Glove having chemical and biological particulate barrier properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BHA Altair, LLC 840 Crescent Centre Dr., Suite 600 Franklin, TN 37067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states BHA Altair, LLC 840 Crescent Centre Dr. Suite 600 Franklin, Tennessee 37067 / US | ||
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states BHA GROUP, INC. 8800 East 63rd Street Kansas City, MO 64133 / US | ||
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states BHA Technologies, Inc. 8800 East 63rd Street Kansas City, MO 64133 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bansal, Vishal 14204 Hadley Street Overland Park, KS 66223 / US | 02 /
King, Clare Rosemary 62 Alumni Avenue Providence, RI 02906 / US | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [2014/09] |
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/33] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06126105.3 | 14.12.2006 | [2007/33] | Priority number, date | US20050300250 | 14.12.2005 Original published format: US 300250 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1818169 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/30, A41D19/015 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
A41D19/015 (EP,US);
A41D31/305 (EP,US);
B32B27/065 (EP,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,US);
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B5/245 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B9/025 (EP,US);
B32B9/046 (EP,US);
B32B2255/02 (EP,US);
B32B2255/102 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,US);
B32B2262/062 (EP,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,US);
B32B2264/108 (EP,US);
B32B2266/0214 (EP,US);
B32B2266/025 (EP,US);
B32B2266/06 (EP,US);
B32B2307/724 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7265 (EP,US);
B32B2437/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24996 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/17] |
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Handschuh mit chemischen und biologischen Partikel-Sperreigenschaften | [2007/33] | English: | Glove having chemical and biological particulate barrier properties | [2007/33] | French: | Gant ayant des propriétés de barrage de particules biologiques et chimiques | [2007/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 16.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/50] | 06.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005036999 (BLUECHER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 13 * * page 6, line 24 * * page 11, line 36 *; | [Y]FR2752994 (MANUFACTURES DE VETEMENTS PAUL [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, lines 4-18 *; | [X]DE20318069U (BLUECHER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] *; | [X]EP0525409 (JAPAN GORE TEX INC [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 22 *; | [Y]US4500581 (MITOMI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * claim 2 * * claim 3 * * claim 4 * * claim 5 * * claim 17 *; | [Y]WO9401198 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO ALFRED [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 3 * |