EP1841282 - Battery contact for a hearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sivantos GmbH Henri-Dunant-Straße 100 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2015/45] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH Gebbertstrasse 125 91058 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasztelan, Thomas An der Wied 18 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Sam Lit, Min Blk 757, Choa Chu Kang North 5, No. 09-125 Singapore 680757 / SG | 03 /
Ong, Vincent Block 441, Hougang Ave 8, No. 03-1651 Singapore 530441 / SG | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | Berg, Peter Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06126130.1 | 14.12.2006 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | DE20061005286 | 06.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006005286 | [2007/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1841282 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1841282 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
H04R25/602 (EP,US);
H04R2225/49 (EP,US);
H04R2225/51 (EP,US);
H04R25/554 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI [2017/02] |
Former [2016/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Batteriekontakt für eine Hörvorrichtung | [2007/40] | English: | Battery contact for a hearing device | [2007/40] | French: | Contact de batterie pour un dispositif d'écoute | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 05.11.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102004051226 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-6 * Abs. 1-11, Abb. 1 *; | [X]US2002155345 (MAPLE LARRY E [US]) [X] 1-6 * Abs. 3-17, 34-90 *; | [X]US2002113572 (ZINK UWE [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * Abs. 2-18, 24-39 *; | [X]US2004081328 (LEEDOM MARVIN A [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * Abs. 6-21, 106; Abb. 8C * |