EP1801597 - Capacitively coupled resonator drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. 101 Columbia Avenue, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Robert J. 11410 NE 124th Street, 565 Kirkland, WA 98034 / US | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhourse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1EW / GB | ||
Former [2007/26] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06126379.4 | 18.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | US20050317959 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 317959 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1801597 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1801597 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/097, G01P15/10, G01P15/125 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
G01P15/097 (EP,US);
G01P15/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/10] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kapazitiv gekoppelte Resonatoransteuerung | [2007/26] | English: | Capacitively coupled resonator drive | [2007/26] | French: | Résonateur à capacité couplée | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 26.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US6145380 (MACGUGAN DOUGLAS C [US]) [XD] 1-10 * column 4, line 14 - line 57 * * column 5, line 47 - line 54 * * figures 3,6 *; | [XD]US6745627 (WOODRUFF JAMES R [US], et al) [XD] 1-10 * column 4, line 26 - line 47 * * column 5, line 1 - line 47 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X] - HELSEL M ET AL, "A navigation grade micro-machined silicon accelerometer", POSITION LOCATION AND NAVIGATION SYMPOSIUM, 1994., IEEE LAS VEGAS, NV, USA 11-15 APRIL 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940411), ISBN 978-0-7803-1435-1, pages 51 - 58, XP010117714 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PLANS.1994.303295 | by applicant | US4372173 | US4766768 | US4901586 | US5005413 | US5241861 | US5331242 | US5367217 | US5456111 | US5668329 | US5948981 | US6145380 | US6745627 |