EP1936638 - An electric insulator and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meier, Patrik Dörfli 22 5603, Staufen / CH | 02 /
Auletta, Tommaso Skepparbacken 4 722 11, Västeras / SE | 03 /
Clifford, Stephen Bärenmattstrasse 4 5620, Bremgarten / CH | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Fröderberg, Anders Oskar BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Fröderberg, Anders Oskar BRANN AB Västgötagatan 2 P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06126385.1 | 18.12.2006 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1936638 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/18, H01B17/00, H01B17/64 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
H01B17/50 (EP,US);
H01B17/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/10] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrischer Insulator und Verwendung damit | [2008/26] | English: | An electric insulator and use thereof | [2008/26] | French: | Isolant électrique et son utilisation | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0513569 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1* page 2, lines 12-17; claims 2,3,6 *; | [A]DE19700387 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP1052654 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [X] 1,2,14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0019] - [0024] - [0035] * * claims 1,4 *; | [X]WO2005017014 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * page 1, lines 1-8 * * page 3, lines 3-12,18,19 * * claims 9,14,16 * |