EP1801183 - Scintillator compositions, and related processes and articles of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2011/08] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states General Electronic Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Srivastava, Alok Mani 1378 Philomena Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
Duclos, Steven Jude 61 Carriage Road Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 03 /
Clarke, Lucas Lemar Rue de Konkel 198 Mailbox 9 Brussels Woluwe St. Lambert 1200 / BE | 04 /
Comanzo, Holly Ann 2506 Eastern Parkway Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | 05 /
Deng, Qun 3333 Hongmei Road 200233, Shanghai / CN | [2010/38] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
Srivastava, Alok Mani 1378 Philomena Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | ||
02 /
Duclos, Steven Jude 61 Carriage Road Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | |||
03 /
Clarke, Lucas Lemar Rue de Konkel 198 Mailbox 9 Brussels Woluwe St. Lmbert 1200 / BE | |||
04 /
Comanzo, Holly Ann 2506 Eastern Parkway Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | |||
05 /
Deng, Qun 3333 Hongmei Road 200233, Shanghai / CN | |||
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
Srivastava, Alok Mani 1378 Philomena Road Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | ||
02 /
Duclos, Steven Jude 61 Carriage Road Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | |||
03 /
Clarke, Lucas Lemar 2421 Marlborough Drive Uniontown, OH 44685 / US | |||
04 /
Comanzo, Holly Ann 2506 Eastern Parkway Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | |||
05 /
Deng, Qun 3333 Hongmei Road 200233, Shanghai / CN | Representative(s) | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Gray, Thomas GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/26] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE International Inc. London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06126459.4 | 19.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | US20050316305 | 20.12.2005 Original published format: US 316305 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1801183 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1801183 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801183 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/85, G21K4/00 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
G21K4/00 (EP,US);
G01T1/185 (KR);
C09K11/7704 (EP,US);
C09K11/7772 (EP,US);
G01T1/2023 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | C09K11/77, G21K4/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Szintillatorzusammensetzungen und damit verbundene Herstellungsverfahren sowie -artikel | [2007/26] | English: | Scintillator compositions, and related processes and articles of manufacture | [2007/26] | French: | Compositions de scintillateur et procédés relatifs et articles de fabrication | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | LT | 23.02.2011 | LV | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | PL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.02.2011 | |
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4761347 (NAKAMURA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US2005082484 (SRIVASTAVA ALOK M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005104001 (SHAH KANAI S [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1739150 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [E] 1,7-9 * paragraphs [0018] , [0029] , [0035]; figures 4,7; claims 1-10 * |