EP1793079 - Apparatus and methods for tubular makeup interlock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb, Inc. 515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. 515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haugen, David, Michael 408 N Iowa Ave League City, TX 77573 / US | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Hagmann-Smith, Martin P. Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | Hagmann-Smith, Martin P. Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06126558.3 | 08.05.2002 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | US20010860127 | 17.05.2001 Original published format: US 860127 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1793079 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1793079 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1793079 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/10, E21B19/06, E21B19/07, E21B19/16 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
E21B19/165 (EP,NO,US);
E21B19/00 (EP,NO,US);
E21B19/16 (EP,NO,US);
E21B41/0021 (EP,NO,US);
E21B44/00 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, NL [2007/23] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für röhrenförmige Ansatz-Arretierung | [2007/23] | English: | Apparatus and methods for tubular makeup interlock | [2007/23] | French: | Appareils et procédés de verrouillage de conditionnement tubulaire | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 25.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02722498.9 / EP1387924 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4091451 (WEINER PETER D, et al) [X] 1,11 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 13 *; | [XY]US4365402 (MCCOMBS RUSSELL L, et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,14,16,17,19 * column 3, line 18 - line 58 * [Y] 24,25; | [A]US4738145 (VINCENT DARRELL L [US], et al) [A] 1,11,22* the whole document *; | [XY]EP0589823 (VARCO INT [US]) [X] 22 * column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 51; figure 1 * [Y] 24,25; | [A]US5791410 (CASTILLE DALE J [US], et al) [A] 5,6,12,13,15,18,20,21 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 8; figure 1 * * figure 5 * |