EP1811600 - Portable device compact antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minard, Philippe La Tremblaie 35250 Saint Médard sur Ille / FR | 02 /
Pintos, Jean-François 16 Allée des Fresnes 35230 Bourgbarre / FR | 03 /
Louzir, Ali 6 rue de la Godmondière 35000 Rennes / FR | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/30] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06127336.3 | 29.12.2006 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | FR20060050153 | 17.01.2006 Original published format: FR 0650153 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1811600 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1811600 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
H01Q1/244 (EP,US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/14] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tragbare Gerätekompaktantenne | [2007/30] | English: | Portable device compact antenna | [2007/30] | French: | Antenne compacte dans un dispositif portable | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 26.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6842149 (TAUBMAN IRVING LOUIS [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 18-23 *; | [A]US6870513 (DENG TEN-LONG [TW], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 12-25 * * column 5, lines 2-30 *; | [A]WO0062432 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6573868 (JOHNSON THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 7 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph 77 * * page 9, paragraph 86 *; | [A]WO2005031916 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 4,5,7 * abstract *; | EP1667279 [ ] (NEC CORP [JP]) [ ] * pages 2-3, paragraphs 8-14 * * page 3, paragraph 33 * |