EP1700931 - Substrate protected by superalloy bond coat system and microcracked thermal barrier coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states The General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagaraj, Bangalore Aswatha 5196 Traverse Court West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
Tomlinson, Thomas John 7456 Quail Run Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 03 /
Patrick, Keith D. 8225 Dimmick Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US | 04 /
Parry, David Walter 3790 Broadview Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45208 / US | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/37] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250050.9 | 05.01.2006 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | US20050073529 | 07.03.2005 Original published format: US 73529 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1700931 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1700931 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00, C23C4/08 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
C23C4/08 (EP,US);
C23C28/321 (EP,US);
C23C28/3215 (EP,US);
C23C28/325 (EP,US);
C23C28/345 (EP,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (US);
Y10T428/12611 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12618 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/13] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geschütztes Substrat mit einer eine Superlegierung enthaltenden Haftungschicht und einer mikrorissigen Wärmedämmschicht | [2006/37] | English: | Substrate protected by superalloy bond coat system and microcracked thermal barrier coating | [2006/37] | French: | Sustrat protégé avec une couche de liason en superalliage et une barrière thérmique ayant des microfissures | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 19.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5035958 (JACKSON MELVIN R [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 4, line 30 - column 4, line 39 *; | [Y]EP0496935 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 10 * claim 7 *; | [DA]US5520516 (TAYLOR THOMAS A [US], et al) [DA] 1,9* the whole document *; | [DA]US5743013 (TAYLOR THOMAS ALAN [US], et al) [DA] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [YD]US6233822 (GROSSKLAUS JR WARREN D [US], et al) [YD] 6 * column 5, line 12 - column 5, line 24 *; | [XY]EP1411148 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7,10 | Examination | EP0712940 | by applicant | US5520516 | US5743013 | US5879753 | US6180262 | US6233822 | US6607611 | US2004109786 |