EP1809063 - Method and apparatus for performing handoff in a mobile communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/29] | Method and apparatus for performing handoff in a mobile communication devices | ||
[2009/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Lianghua 221 Queen Street South, Apt.1710 Kitchner Ontario Canada N2G 1W5 / CA | 02 /
Huang, Wenjie 907-547 Belmont Ave, Kitchener Ontario Canada N2M5G9 / CA | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250167.1 | 13.01.2006 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809063 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809063 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/10 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
H04L1/0072 (EP);
H04W36/0061 (EP);
H04L1/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Extension states | AL | 28.12.2007 | BA | 28.12.2007 | HR | 28.12.2007 | MK | 28.12.2007 | YU | 28.12.2007 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausführen eines Weiterreichens in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationsgerät | [2009/52] | English: | Method and apparatus for performing handoff in a mobile communication device | [2009/50] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'exécution de transfert dans un dispositif de communication mobile | [2007/29] |
Former [2007/29] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Ausführen von Weiterreichen in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationsgerät | ||
Former [2007/29] | Method and apparatus for performing handoff in a mobile communication devices | Examination procedure | 03.02.2006 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 05.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | HU | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | LT | 28.04.2010 | LV | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | CY | 12.05.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | IS | 28.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | IE | 13.01.2011 | LU | 13.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2011 | ||
LU | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2011 | ||
LU | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2011 | ||
LU | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5081679 (DENT PAUL [SE]) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * column 4, lines 20-54 * * column 5, lines 39-58 * * column 6, lines 46-61 * * column 8, line 59 - column 9, line 56 * * column 14, line 29 - column 15, line 20 *; | [XA]US5182753 (DAHLIN JAN E A S [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-13,16-19,22-27,30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [0009] - [0013] - [0015] , [0021] , [0022] , [0027] , [0029] , [0039] - [0048]; figures 1-2a * [A] 4,5,14,15,20,21,28,29; | [X]US5546464 (RAITH KRISTER A [US], et al) [X] 31-43 * abstract * * column 2, lines 29-40 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 39 * * column 5, line 21 - column 7, line 5 *; | [X]US5570467 (SAWYER FRANCOIS [CA]) [X] 31-43 * abstract * * column 1, lines 25-32 * * column 5, lines 25-63 * * column 7, lines 50-67 * * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 4 * * column 13, line 42 - column 14, line 40 * * column 15, lines 3-15 *; | [A]US2004095953 (BELLIER THIERRY [DK], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * column 1, lines 36-53 * * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 9 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 40 * * column 9, lines 15-60 *; | [X]WO2005120116 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-30 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 11 * * page 6, lines 16-24 * * page 7, lines 6-18 * * page 9, lines 14-22 * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 17 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 19 *; | [XA] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+)", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200504), vol. 3-G2;SMG2, no. V8260, ISSN 0000-0001, pages 1 - 316, XP014027262 [X] 31-33,36-38,40,43 * pages 40-43 * * pages 47-52 * [A] 34,35,41,42 | [A] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+) Base Stations System (MS - BSS) Interface Data Link (DL) Layer Specification (3GPP TS 04.06 version 8.2.1 Release 1999)", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200205), vol. 3-G2, no. V821, ISSN 0000-0001, pages 1 - 59, XP014005763 [A] 31-43 * pages 20,22,33 * * pages 34,36,51 * | by applicant | US5546464 | US5570467 |