EP1684527 - Apparatus and method for reducing blocking artifacts in an image display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bae, Mun Sik 1-104, Dormitory, 756, Jigok-dong, Nam-gu,Pohangsi Gyeongsanbuk-do / KR | 02 /
Song, Woo Jin 106-803, Hanbo-Mido Mansion, 511, Daechi-dong Gangnam-gu, Seoul / KR | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/30] | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250177.0 | 13.01.2006 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | KR20050003772 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: KR 2005003772 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1684527 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1684527 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/30, H04N7/50 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
H04N19/86 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/14 (EP,US);
H04N19/182 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/80 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/30] | H04N7/26, H04N7/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2012/28] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reduktion von Blockartefakten in einem Bildanzeigegerät | [2006/30] | English: | Apparatus and method for reducing blocking artifacts in an image display device | [2006/30] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la réduction des artefacts de blocs dans un dispositif d'affichage d'image | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 16.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.07.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.02.2013 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 06.03.2013 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0917357 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-20,22-26,28 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1,6,7 * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0097]; figures 8,10 * [I] 4,12,21,27; | [A]WO02096117 (PACE SOFT SILICON LTD [IE], et al) [A] 4,12,21,27 * Section "Non-linear filtering" on pages 6 and 7 *; | [A]GB2323235 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * figures 3A, 3B * |