EP1684519 - System and method for multimedia delivery in a wireless environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ViXS Systems Inc. 1210 Sheppard Ave. E. Suite 800 Toronto, ON M2K 1E3 / CA | [2008/52] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Vixs Systems Inc. Parkway Place 245 Consumers Road, Suite 301 Toronto, Ontario M2J 1R3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ducharme, Paul 1527-3 Greystone Walk Drive Scarborough, Ontario M1K 5J4 / CA | 02 /
Girardeau, James 2000 Mountainview Drive Austin, TX 78703 / US | 03 /
Chiu, Adeline 1029 Falconer Road Edmonton, Alberta T6R 2C6 / CA | 04 /
Doyle, James 155 Dalhousie Street, Apt. 1108 Toronto, Ontario M5B 2P7 / CA | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2010/34] | Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2007/18] | Cage, John David 19 Laines Head Chippenham Wilts SN15 1PH / GB | ||
Former [2006/30] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC2A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250273.7 | 19.01.2006 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | US20050038856 | 20.01.2005 Original published format: US 38856 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1684519 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1684519 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1684519 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/00 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
H04N21/2383 (EP,US);
H04N21/23406 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/4305 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/44004 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/30] | H04N7/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/19] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Multimedialieferung in einer drahtlosen Umgebung | [2006/30] | English: | System and method for multimedia delivery in a wireless environment | [2006/30] | French: | Procédé et système pour la livraison de multimedia dans dans un environnement sans fil | [2012/35] |
Former [2006/30] | Procede et systeme pour la livraison de multimedia dans dans un environnement sans fil | Examination procedure | 15.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 07.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.04.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003169776 (REESOR GORD [CA]) [X] 1-5,10-25 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004174907 (VAN DER PUTTEN FRANK OCTAAF [BE], et al) [X] 1-5,10-25 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0209331 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,10-25 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - page 4, line 15 * * page 5, line 11 - page 16, line 32 * * figure 2 *; | [X]EP1089482 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,10-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0130] * * figures 1-31 *; | [A]EP1339182 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-5,10-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0053] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A] - BERTOGLIO L ET AL, "Intermedia synchronization for videoconference over IP", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (199909), vol. 15, no. 1-2, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 149 - 164, XP004180642 [A] 1-5,10-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0923-5965(99)00028-4 |