EP1685818 - Birthing support apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 530 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2006/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heimbrock, Richard Henry 1041 Pine Knot Drive Cincinnati Ohio 45238 / US | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/31] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street GB-London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250441.0 | 26.01.2006 | [2006/31] | Priority number, date | US20050648632P | 31.01.2005 Original published format: US 648632 P | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685818 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1685818 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61G13/00, A61G7/075 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
A61G13/0009 (EP,US);
A61G7/0755 (EP,US);
A61G13/12 (EP,US);
A61G13/1245 (EP,US);
A61G13/125 (EP,US);
A61G15/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/15] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entbindungstragvorrichtung | [2006/31] | English: | Birthing support apparatus | [2006/31] | French: | Dispositif de support d'accouchement | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 03.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.04.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2067414 (MARZET RENE ETS) [X] 10-14,17-19 * abstract * [A] 1,20; | [X]US4407277 (ELLISON ARTHUR E [US]) [X] 10-14,17-19 * column 5, lines 12-48; figure 5 *; | [A]US4821350 (FELDT MATS [SE]) [A] 10* abstract *; | [X]US4913413 (RAAB SIMON [CA]) [X] 10-14,17-19 * column 6, lines 11-18 * * column 7, lines 1-24; figures 9,12 *; | [A]DE19853270 (MAQUET AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,20 * column 2, lines 52-59; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | GB2067414 | US4407277 |