EP1761039 - Apparatus and method for correcting image distorsion in display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bae, Sam Bong 520, Yuldo-ri Changseon-myeon Namhae-gun Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Camp, Ronald, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250582.1 | 03.02.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | KR20050082788 | 06.09.2005 Original published format: KR 2005082788 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1761039 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1761039 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/23, G09G1/16, H04N3/233 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H04N3/2335 (EP,US);
H04N3/23 (KR);
G09G1/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/10] | H04N3/23 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/24] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zur Korrektur von Bildverzerrungen in einer Anzeigevorrichtung | [2007/10] | English: | Apparatus and method for correcting image distorsion in display device | [2007/10] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour corrriger les distorsions d'image dans un dispositif d'affichage | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/40] | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0474420 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [I]WO9403920 (CAPETRONIC COMPUTER USA HK INC [US]) [I] 1,7,17 * the whole document *; | [I]US5506481 (WADA AKIRA [JP], et al) [I] 1-24 * column 20, line 33 - column 40, line 31; figures 4,5,10,25,32 *; | [I]WO9741680 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO9858500 (DISPLAY LAB INC [US]) [X] 1,7,17 * page 8; figures 1-16, 19, 23 * * page 12 - page 32 * [I] 1-24 |