EP1712737 - Crescentic ramp turbine stage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states The General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Ching-Pang 12 Camargo Pine Lane Cincinnati Ohio 45243 / US | 02 /
Kirtley, Kevin Richard 730 Tanner Road Clifton Park, NY 12065 / US | 03 /
Tam, Anna 730 Tanner Road Clifton Park New York 12065 / US | 04 /
Lamson, Scott Henry 3 Brookside Avenue Menands Newyork 12204 / US | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2006/42] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250684.5 | 09.02.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | US20050106198 | 14.04.2005 Original published format: US 106198 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1712737 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1712737 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
F01D5/143 (EP,US);
F05D2250/711 (EP,US);
F05D2250/712 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US);
Y10S415/914 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/26] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbmondförmiger Turbinenschaufel-/Plattformübergang | [2006/42] | English: | Crescentic ramp turbine stage | [2006/42] | French: | Jonction d'aube de tubine / plate-forme en demi-lune | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5832903 ; | [A]US4778338 (BESSAY RAYMOND [FR]) [A] 1,5,6 * column 8, line 49 - column 8, line 68; figures 14,15 *; | [A]US2004081548 (ZESS GARY A [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 33 - page 3, paragraph 43; figures 3-8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830517), vol. 007, no. 112, Database accession no. (M - 215), & JP58032903 A 19830226 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [X] 1-3,6-8,10 * abstract * |