EP1690572 - Electronic multi-play poker game with pool hand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waterleaf Ltd. Top Floor 14 Athol Street Douglas Isle of Man IM1 1JA / GB | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verardi, Francesco 20 Cronk Drean Douglas Isle of Man IM2 6AX / GB | 02 /
Novellie, Michael Paul 5 The Chase Ballakillowey Isle of Man IM9 4BL / GB | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Butler, Michael John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2006/33] | Butler, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250789.2 | 14.02.2006 | [2006/33] | Priority number, date | US20050058680 | 14.02.2005 Original published format: US 58680 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1690572 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1690572 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1690572 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/00, G07F17/32, // A63F1/00 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
G07F17/3293 (EP,US);
A63F1/00 (EP,US);
A63F3/00157 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
A63F2001/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/33] | A63F3/00, // A63F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Title | German: | Elektronisches Pokerspiel mit mehreren Spielvarianten und 'pool hand' | [2006/33] | English: | Electronic multi-play poker game with pool hand | [2006/33] | French: | Poker électronique multi-jeux avec 'pool hand' | [2006/33] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Request for further processing for: | 15.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2006 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | IE | 14.02.2012 | LU | 14.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 14.02.2012 | ||
LU | 14.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 14.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 14.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0893147 (MOODY ERNEST W [US]) [A] 29-35* the whole document *; | [X]US2002107063 (ASHLEY STEPHEN EUGENE [US], et al) [X] 22-25,27,28 * page 2, paragraphs 22-25; figures 1-4c *; | [X]WO03034358 (WATERLEAF LTD [GB], et al) [X] 29-35 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2003155716 (PARKER ALAN GEOFFREY [GB]) [X] 22-25,27,28 * page 2, paragraph 47 - page 3, paragraph 62; figures 1-3 * [Y] 26; | [XY]US2004004324 (STEFAN ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 22-25,27,28 * page 1, paragraphs 13-15 * * page 2, paragraphs 21-26; figures 1-5 * [Y] 26; | [X]US2004113363 (MOODY ERNEST W [US]) [X] 22-25,27,28 * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 4, paragraph 54; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2004160008 (SAWYER THOMAS E [US]) [X] 29-35 * page 1, paragraph 7 - page 2, paragraph 13 * * page 2, paragraph 22; figure 4 * | by applicant | US5823873 | US6007066 |