EP1695741 - Apparatus for treatment of obesity with an ultrasound device movable in two or three axes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/35] | Methods and apparatus for treatment of obesity with an ultrasound device movable in two or three axes | ||
[2009/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EndoVx, Inc. 984 Vallejo Street Napa, California 94559 / US | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aldrich, William N. PO Box 6528 Napa, California 94581 / US | 02 /
Miller, David 984 Vallejo Street Napa CA 94559 / US | [2006/46] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
Aldrich, William N. PO Box 6528 Napa, California 94581 / US | ||
02 /
Miller, David 1766 Sand Hill, Nr. 404 Palo Alto California 94304 / US | |||
Former [2006/35] | 01 /
Aldrich, William N. 2288 Monticello Road Napa, California 94558 / US | ||
02 /
Miller, David 1766 Sand Hill, Nr. 404 Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Representative(s) | Baker, Colin John Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Baker, Colin John Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250983.1 | 24.02.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | US20050067063 | 24.02.2005 Original published format: US 67063 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1695741 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/02, A61B18/14, G10K11/35, // A61B8/12, A61B18/00, A61B17/00, A61B18/18, A61B18/02, A61B18/04 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
A61B8/4461 (EP,US);
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B8/445 (EP,US);
A61N7/02 (EP,US);
A61N7/022 (EP,US);
A61B18/02 (EP,US);
A61B18/04 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00026 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22051 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00011 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Fettsucht mit einer in zwei oder drei Achsen beweglichen Ultraschallvorrichtung | [2009/26] | English: | Apparatus for treatment of obesity with an ultrasound device movable in two or three axes | [2009/26] | French: | Appareil pour le traitement de l'obésité comprenant un dispositif à ultrasons mobile sur deux ou trois axes | [2009/26] |
Former [2006/35] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Fettsucht mit einer in zwei oder drei Achsen beweglichen Ultraschallvorrichtung | ||
Former [2006/35] | Methods and apparatus for treatment of obesity with an ultrasound device movable in two or three axes | ||
Former [2006/35] | Procédés et appareil pour le traitement de l'obésité comprenant un dispositif à ultrasons mobile sur deux ou trois axes | Examination procedure | 09.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002068963 (MAKI SHIN [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,16,20-22,24,25 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0165]; figures 2,4A,8,9,11,12,14,18,22,24 *; | [X]WO2004082763 (NAPA MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,16,17,19-26 * page 3, line 23 - page 6, line 17; figures 14-16 *; | [X]US2004082859 (SCHAER ALAN [US]) [X] 1-8,14-16,19-26 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0217]; figures 47,48a-d,51,52a-b *; | [X]US2002138075 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [X] 1-8,14-18,20,21,23-25 * column A * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0115]; figures 2a,4a-b,5a-b,8-10,12-15,26 *; | [A]US6371903 (BLANC EMMANUEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-9,12-16,19-22,24,25 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 50; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5720287 (CHAPELON JEAN-YVES [FR], et al) [A] 1-8,12,15,16,19-22,24,25 * column W *; | [A]US6669655 (ACKER DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1-8,12,16,19,20,24,25 * column 3, line 21 - column 8, line 14; figure 5 *; | [A]US2004267167 (PODANY VACLAV [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8-14,20-24 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1,2,4A * | by applicant | WO2004082763 | US2002068963 |