EP1699021 - Connection adapter for communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Kazuya c/o Sanden Corporation 20, Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | 02 /
Tabata, Masaru c/o Sanden Corporation 20, Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | 03 /
Iwasaki, Wataru c/o Sanden Corporation 20, Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Kiyoshi c/o Sanden Corporation 20, Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | 05 /
Kuwako, Yuuji c/o Sanden Corporation 20, Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251103.5 | 01.03.2006 | [2006/36] | Priority number, date | JP20050058078 | 02.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005058078 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1699021 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07F9/02, H04L12/56, H04L12/28, H04L29/06 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
G07F9/026 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Title | German: | Anschlussadapter für eine Kommunikationsvorrichtung | [2006/36] | English: | Connection adapter for communication device | [2006/36] | French: | Adaptateur de connexion pour un dispositif de communication | [2006/36] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/14] | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4760395 (KATZEFF KURT [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 4 ** figure - *; | [X]US6028984 (KIMBALL ROBERT H [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 21-33 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 34 * * figure - *; | [A]GB2355375 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP1168770 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]DE10054027 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]DE20314317U (AUDIOTON KABELWERK SCHEINFELD [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * claim - * * figure - *; | [X]US2004053636 (OGUMA KENJI [JP]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0008] , [0011] , [0013] , [0015] , [0037] , [0042] , [0047] - [0052] - [0062] - [0073] - [0103] * * claim - * * figure - *; | [A]US2004128201 (OFIR JACOB [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0041] - [0095] - [0108] * * claim - * * figure - *; | [A]EP1494417 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0032]; figure - * |