EP1702849 - Registration of intermittently moved fastener tape with continuously moving web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026-1215 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howell, Clifton Ronald 3397 Seneca Farms Drive Busford, GA 30519 / US | 02 /
Wallace, David C. 3443 Runelle Place Lilburn, GA 30047 / US | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251212.4 | 07.03.2006 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | US20050081368 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: US 81368 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1702849 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1702849 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65B61/18, B31B19/90, B65B9/20, // B65B9/20 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
B65B9/20 (EP,US);
B65B61/188 (EP,US);
B31B70/006 (EP,US);
B31B70/8131 (EP,US);
B31B70/8132 (EP,US);
Y10S493/927 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/02] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anpassung des stoßweise bewegten Verschlussbandes mit der kontinuierlich bewegten Folie | [2006/38] | English: | Registration of intermittently moved fastener tape with continuously moving web | [2006/38] | French: | Adaptation du mouvement par intermittence de la bande de fermeture avec le mouvement continu de la feuille | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 31.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 07.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | EP09171543.3 / EP2145825 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 03.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.09.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1253005 (CMD CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract ** figure 2 *; | [X]EP1295797 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,4,6 * * claims 7,11 * * paragraph [0013] * * column 3, line 6 - line 9 * * column 3, line 32 - line 40 * |