EP1701074 - Soft ventable relief valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN HYDRAULICS CORPORATION 1500 West University Parkway Sarasota, FL 34243 / US | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prinsen, Todd 5549 Rollingwood Drive Sarasota, Florida 34243 / US | 02 /
Zähe, Bernd Haupstrasse 89 Linnich 52441 / DE | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251297.5 | 10.03.2006 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | US20050660722P | 11.03.2005 Original published format: US 660722 P | US20060359653 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: US 359653 | [2006/44] |
Former [2006/37] | US20050660722P | 11.03.2005 | |
US20060359653 | 16.02.2006 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1701074 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1701074 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1701074 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/04 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
F16K17/0433 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7766 (EP,US);
Y10T137/777 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [2008/21] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckbegrezungsventil mit Entlüftungsdämpfung | [2006/37] | English: | Soft ventable relief valve | [2006/37] | French: | Soupape de sûreté avec purge d'amortissement | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 13.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.10.2010 | GB | 10.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2011 | LI | 31.03.2011 | [2012/11] |
Former [2012/07] | IT | 20.10.2010 | |
CH | 31.03.2011 | ||
LI | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | IT | 20.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3318246 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US4742846 (DIBARTOLO ERNEST A [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US4834135 (DIBARTOLO ERNEST A [US]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [AD]EP1001197 (SUN HYDRAULICS CORP [US]) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6039070 | US6119722 |