EP1705507 - Lens-position controller and imaging module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinoshita, Kazuo Laforet Kidera 202 23-1 Nishikidera-cho Nara-shi Nara 630-8307 / JP | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251490.6 | 21.03.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | JP20050082532 | 22.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005082532 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705507 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/08, // G02B1/06 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
G02B1/06 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/08 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/023 (KR);
G03B3/10 (KR);
G03B30/00 (KR);
H04N23/60 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/22] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Linsenpositionssteuerung und Abbildungsmodul | [2006/39] | English: | Lens-position controller and imaging module | [2006/39] | French: | Contrôleur de position de lentille et module d'imagerie | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 28.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 05.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5552009 ; | [X]JPH0846840 ; | [X]JPS4890538 (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,2,4,14* figure 1 *; | [X]US4907021 (YABU SHUICHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,14 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 33 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 9 *; | [X]DE19733628 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,3,14 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-3 *; | [PX]EP1600100 (STM MEDTECH STARNBERG [DE]) [PX] 1-4,7,13,14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0032] - [0050] , [0053]; figures 1-7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800627), vol. 004, no. 090, Database accession no. (P - 017), & JP55052009 A 19800416 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08046840 A 19960216 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,3,4,8-11,13,14 * abstract * |